EP0949731 - Nitride semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Kunio 78-1, Kowata-minamiyama Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0002 / JP | 02 /
Yuri, Masaaki 6-26-1201, Funaki-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0828 / JP | 03 /
Hashimoto, Tadao 1-23-2-202, Suido-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0026 / JP | 04 /
Ishida, Masahiro 24-6, Ikaga-nishimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0066 / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106798.4 | 06.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980093086 | 06.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9308698 | JP19980139443 | 21.05.1998 Original published format: JP 13944398 | JP19980148996 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14899698 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949731 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949731 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949731 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/323, H01S5/343, H01S5/028 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/0281 (EP,US);
H01S5/0287 (EP,US);
H01S5/10 (EP,US);
H01S5/34333 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | H01S3/19, H01S3/025 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/40] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser aus einer Nitridverbindung | [1999/41] | English: | Nitride semiconductor laser device | [1999/41] | French: | Laser à semi-conducteur comprenant un composè de nitrure | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03209895 ; | [A]JPS61134094 ; | [A]JPH04208585 ; | [A]JPH06268327 ; | [A]JPS599989 ; | [A]JPS5889890 ; | [A]JPH08191171 ; | [A]JPH02137287 ; | [A]US5321713 (KHAN MUHAMMAD A [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 30 * * column 8, line 11 - column 8, line 45; figures 3,5 *; | [A] - NAKAMURA S, "RT-CW Operation of InGaN multi-quantum-well structure laser diodes", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, vol. 50, no. 1-3, ISSN 0921-5107, page 277-284, XP004119149 [A] 1,3 * page 279; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(97)00190-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911206), vol. 015, no. 482, Database accession no. (E - 1142), & JP03209895 A 19910912 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD;OTHERS: 02) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861108), vol. 010, no. 329, Database accession no. (E - 452), & JP61134094 A 19860621 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921119), vol. 016, no. 550, Database accession no. (E - 1292), & JP04208585 A 19920730 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941219), vol. 018, no. 673, Database accession no. (E - 1647), & JP06268327 A 19940922 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840426), vol. 008, no. 091, Database accession no. (E - 241), & JP59009989 A 19840119 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830816), vol. 007, no. 186, Database accession no. (E - 193), & JP58089890 A 19830528 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08191171 A 19960723 (NICHIA CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900813), vol. 014, no. 374, Database accession no. (E - 0964), & JP02137287 A 19900525 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |