Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974284

EP0974284 - Piece of jewellery, in particular bracelet, with improved spring locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PESAVENTO S.r.l.
Via Vecchia Ferriera 50
36100 Vicenza VI / IT
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Pasavento, Marino
Via Vecchia Ferriera 50
36100 Vicenza VI / IT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/10]De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/04]La Ciura, Salvatore
Via Francesco Sforza 3
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99106859.407.04.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateIT1998VI0006020.07.1998         Original published format: IT VI980060
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974284
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974284
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A44C5/12, A44C7/00, A44C9/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schmuckstück, insbesondere Armband, mit verbesserter Federschliesssung[2000/04]
English:Piece of jewellery, in particular bracelet, with improved spring locking device[2000/04]
French:Bijou, en particulier un bracelet, avec un ressort de verrouillage[2000/04]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, IE, LU, MC, SE
12.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2003Fee for grant paid
12.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
IT03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
DE04.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
GB07.04.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]AT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
DE04.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
GB07.04.2004
Former [2005/45]AT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
DE04.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
GB07.04.2004
Former [2004/46]AT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
DE04.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/44]AT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
DE04.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/28]AT03.09.2003
BE03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
Former [2004/13]NL03.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0375565  (CREATES ALLAN B ;BREQUE JEAN (FR)) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 5 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 9 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US2713863  (HANDERSON PHILIP C.) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 13-20; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US3805548  (MATWIJCOW J) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [PX]US5816073  (BARDISBANYAN VAHRAN) [PX] 1,3 * the whole document *