Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971359

EP0971359 - Equipment control command processing system and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.02.2012  [2012/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kondo, Satoshi
7-17, Otokoyama Shigetsu
Yawata-shi, Kyoto-fu 614-8361 / JP
02 / Muraki, Kenji
2-3-9-411, Toyosato, Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 533-0013 / JP
03 / Yamada, Jiro
7-5-1-2, Hikaridai, Seika-cho
Souraku-gun, Kyoto-fu 619-0237 / JP
 [2011/10]
Former [2000/02]01 / Kondo, Satoshi
7-17, Otokoyama Shigetsu
Yawata-shi, Kyoto-fu 614-8361 / JP
02 / Muraki, Kenji
2-3-9-411, Toyosato, Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka.shi, Osaka-fu 533-0013 / JP
03 / Yamada, Jiro
7-5-1-2, Hikaridai, Seika-cho
Souraku-gun, Kyoto-fu 619-0237 / JP
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99106893.308.04.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998009909510.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9909598
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971359
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971359
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/36, G11B27/10, G11B27/11, G11B27/32, G11B19/02
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Anlagesteuerbefehlen[2000/02]
English:Equipment control command processing system and method thereof[2000/02]
French:Système et méthode pour le traitement de commandes de contrôle d'équipement[2000/02]
Examination procedure29.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2011Fee for grant paid
27.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
03.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9831121  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1,13 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 30 *;
 [A]JPH08106765  ;
 [A]JPH07192436  ;
 [A]JPH06162740  ;
 [A]EP0467587  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09120666  ;
 [A]WO9715052  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,13,14,16 * & P,A: US 5 825 739 (20 October 1998); column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 34 *;
 [PA]WO9906997  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [PA] 1,2,13 * page 10, line 16 - page 13, line 18 *
 [PY]  - "AV/C Digital Interface Command Set General Specification - VERSION 3.0", TRADE ASSOCIATION - TA DOCUMENT, XX, XX, XX, (19980415), vol. 1998003, XP002111053 [PY] 1-18 * pages 20-34, 49-60 *
 [PY]  - "AV/C Disc Subunit General Specification (URL)", (19000101), URL: INTERNET, XP002111054 [PY] 1-18 * pages 17-24, 99-101, 126-127 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, [A] 1-3,5,13,14,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, [A] 1-3,5,13,14,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940914), vol. 018, no. 494, Database accession no. (P - 1800), [A] 1-3,5,13,14,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, [A] 1,2,13 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0812092