Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971069

EP0971069 - Mixing and recirculation circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/51]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Binder, Erwin
Öhringer Weg 3
89522 Heidenheim / DE
02 / Beuermann, Karl-Heinz
Göppinger Weg 7
89518 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date99106910.508.04.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813060009.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830600
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971069
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971069
Date:28.06.2000
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971069
Date:26.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:D21F1/66
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   SE [2001/10]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Misch- und Rezirkulationskreislauf[2000/02]
English:Mixing and recirculation circuit[2000/02]
French:Circuit de mélange et de recirculation[2000/02]
Examination procedure28.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
14.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2002Fee for grant paid
03.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4000558  (ENSO GUTZEIT OY [FI]) [A] 1,13 * page 3, line 8 - line 25; figure . *;
 [DA]US4477313  (ANDERSSON ANDERS I [SE]) [DA] 1,13;
 [DA]DE19509522  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,13
by applicantUS4477313
 DE19509522