Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0951996

EP0951996 - Control of a ductor roller in a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mülheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mühlheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Joachim
Wolfratshauser Strasse 90
82049 Pullach / DE
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG
Intellectual Property (IPB)
Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [1999/43]Stahl, Dietmar
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung RTB,Werk S Postfach 101264
63012 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date99106989.909.04.1999
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateDE1998207277U22.04.1998         Original published format: DE 29807277 U
[1999/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0951996
Date:27.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0951996
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0951996
Date:06.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/14
[1999/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/05]
Former [1999/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerung für ein Heberfarbwerk einer Druckmaschine[1999/43]
English:Control of a ductor roller in a printing machine[1999/43]
French:Contrôle du rouleau preneur d'une machine à imprimer[1999/43]
Examination procedure21.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
24.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2003Fee for grant paid
27.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.08.2003
SE06.11.2003
GB09.04.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/45]SE06.11.2003
GB09.04.2004
Former [2004/16]SE06.11.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19517154  (BOSSE ROLF DR ING [DE]);
 [A]GB2193926  (RATBY ENG CO LTD);
 [AD]DE4314426  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]);
 [AD]DE4436953  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE])