Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0949835

EP0949835 - Handoff method between a CDMA and another cellular system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kubota, Hiroshi, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/41]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/41]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107036.809.04.1999
[1999/41]
Priority number, dateJP1998009921410.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9921498
JP1999006608912.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6608999
[1999/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0949835
Date:13.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0949835
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[1999/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/52]
Former [1999/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Weiterreichungsverfahren zwischen einem CDMA und einem anderen zellularen System[1999/41]
English:Handoff method between a CDMA and another cellular system[1999/41]
French:Méthode de transfert d'appel entre AMRC et un autre système cellulaire[1999/41]
Examination procedure15.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
27.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9744984  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * column W *;
 [X]WO9631078  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 6, line 29 - page 10, line 19 * * claim - *;
 [A]  HOLCMAN A R ET AL, "CDMA INTERSYSTEM OPERATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19940608), vol. CONF. 44, pages 590 - 594, XP000496745 [A] 1-7
 [A]  SATARASINGHE P, "A NOVEL METHOD FOR CDMA HARD HANDOFF", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19961118), ISBN 0-7803-3337-3, pages 1766 - 1768, XP000748752 [A] 1-7