Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0951089

EP0951089 - Dielectric filter, dielectric duplexer, mounting structure thereof, and communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[2006/34]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toda, Jun, c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Int. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Maruyama, Takashi, c/o Murata Manufacturing Co.
Int. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / Ishihara, Jinsei, c/o Murata Manufacturing Co.
Int. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
04 / Kato, Hideyuki, c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Int. Prop. Dept., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107041.809.04.1999
[1999/42]
Priority number, dateJP1998010826417.04.1998         Original published format: JP 10826498
JP1999004274622.02.1999         Original published format: JP 4274699
[1999/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0951089
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0951089
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0951089
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01P1/205, H01P1/213
[1999/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/04]
Former [1999/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dielektrisches Filter, dielektrischer Duplexer, Montierungsstruktur und Kommunikationsvorrichtung[1999/42]
English:Dielectric filter, dielectric duplexer, mounting structure thereof, and communication device[1999/42]
French:Filtre diélectrique, duplexeur diélectrique, structure de montage et dispositif de communication[1999/42]
Examination procedure09.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
22.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2006Fee for grant paid
06.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR23.08.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]FR11.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03136502  ;
 [A]US4342972  (NISHIKAWA TOSHIO, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 12 - line 16; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH0197002  ;
 [A]JPH05226909
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910909), vol. 15, no. 355, Database accession no. (E - 1109), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890726), vol. 13, no. 333, Database accession no. (E - 794), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931213), vol. 17, no. 676, Database accession no. (E - 1475), [A] 1,2 * abstract *