Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970598

EP0970598 - Rotobaler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kverneland Geldrop B.V.
Postbus 9
5660 AA Geldrop / NL
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / van den Wildenberg, Leonardus Johannes
Broekkant 30
6021 CT Budel / NL
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107051.709.04.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE1998212264U09.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29812264 U
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970598
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970598
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01F15/07
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rundballenpresse[2000/02]
English:Rotobaler[2000/02]
French:Presse à balles rondes[2000/02]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
01.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2002Fee for grant paid
31.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL15.01.2003
BE30.04.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2003/41]NL15.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE29706544U  (GREENLAND GELDROP BV [NL]) [AD] 1,2,5 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2090560  (BROCKDALE DEVELOPMENTS LTD) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 21; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2150491  (LELY NV C VAN DER)
by applicantDE29706540U
 EP0125719