Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0952166

EP0952166 - Filmforming polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/43]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hien, Stefan Dr.
Fürther Strasse 54
91058 Erlangen / DE
02 / Sebald, Michael Dr.
Mitteldorfer Weg 14
91085 Weisendorf / DE
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107109.312.04.1999
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateDE199811844624.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19818446
[1999/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0952166
Date:27.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0952166
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0952166
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F222/16, C08F230/08, C08F230/04, C08F222/20, G03F7/039
[1999/43]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/44]
Former [1999/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filmbildende Polymere[1999/43]
English:Filmforming polymers[1999/43]
French:Polymères filmogènes[1999/43]
Examination procedure03.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2003Fee for grant paid
26.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0388484  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-5,9-11 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 15 *;
 [DA]WO9624621  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-4 * claims 1-3 * * example 1 * * page 4, lines 4-16 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5237024  (ALLBERRY DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,7 * * column 2, lines 35-47 * * example 1 *;
 [A]EP0342493  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,4,5,7 * * page 2, lines 34,35,38 * * page 3, lines 25-42 * * page 4, line 4 *;
 [A]EP0841353  (WITCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-4 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 29 *;
 [A]EP0412385  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,7,8,11,12 * * page 3, lines 28-53 *;
 [A]JPS62172342
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 36, Database accession no. 1987-252533, XP002004078 & JPS62172342 A 19870729 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract *