EP0950625 - Haulage car for paper rolls and paper roll transporting system for such a car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welte, Friedel-Edmund Teuchelweg 21 75365 Calw / DE | [1999/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Pfiz, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/42] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107287.7 | 14.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | DE1998116441 | 14.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19816441 | [1999/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950625 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950625 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950625 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12, B65H19/30 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
B65H19/12 (EP);
B65H19/30 (EP);
B65H2301/4172 (EP);
B65H2301/41745 (EP);
B65H2405/422 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/42] | B65H19/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2001/27] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [2001/17] | |||
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Papierrollen-Transportwagen und Papierrollen-Transportsystem für einen derartigen Transportwagen | [1999/42] | English: | Haulage car for paper rolls and paper roll transporting system for such a car | [1999/42] | French: | Chariot transporteur pour rouleaux de papier et système de transport de rouleaux de papier pour un tel chariot | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 13.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2002 | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.12.2004 | FR | 29.12.2004 | GB | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.03.2005 | AT | 14.04.2005 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
FR | 29.12.2004 | ||
GB | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
AT | 14.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
FR | 29.12.2004 | ||
GB | 29.12.2004 | ||
AT | 14.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
FR | 29.12.2004 | ||
GB | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GB | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GB | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3010410 (DANIELS HERBERT E) [A] 1,16 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0390735 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [AD] 1,16* figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0402902 (HAINES & EMERSON INC [US]) [X] 1-5,14-16,19,25,30 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 45; figure - *; | [XDA]EP0700854 (BHS CORR MASCH & ANLAGENBAU [DE]) [XD] 1-5,14,15 * figure -; claim 1 * [A] 16; | [YA]DE29609589U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 12,13 * page 2, line 12 - line 25; figure - * [A] 1,16; | [XY]DE29700874U (PUNKTUM PROJEKTBERATUNG FUER D [DE]) [X] 1-5,16-20,25 * das ganze Dokument * [Y] 12,13 |