blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1046646 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1046646



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 105
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
13.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
27.04.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.05.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.04.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 7
13.04.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
13.11.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.09.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.07.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
26.05.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.05.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.05.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
20.05.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
06.05.2003 Description Search / examination 2
06.05.2003 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2003 Description Search / examination 2
26.03.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
23.08.2002 Description Search / examination 8
23.08.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.09.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.08.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
10.12.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 6
06.10.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
19.04.1999 Description Search / examination 8
19.04.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6