blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1046646


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
29.04.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
07.05.2004 (Expected) grant published on  23.06.2004  [2004/26]
28.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.04.2004 Change - applicant published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
19.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.07.2003 Change - applicant published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
22.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.05.2003 Renewal fee
04.04.2003 Examination report or reply
22.11.2002 Examination report or reply
30.08.2002 Examination report or reply
06.08.2002 Examination report or reply
07.05.2002 Renewal fee
28.03.2002 First examination report
26.03.2002 Examination report or reply
27.09.2001 Change - extension states
01.06.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  18.07.2001 [2001/29]
11.04.2001 Renewal fee
22.12.2000 Request for examination filed published on  07.02.2001 [2001/06]
08.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.2000 [2000/43]