blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1046646
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2000302792Global Dossier 31.10.2000A
Priority number Date
JP11085399 19.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1181080C 22.12.2004C
CN1272498 08.11.2000A
Priority number Date
CN99105333 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI243174B 11.11.2005B
Priority number Date
KR19990000551 23.04.1999
JP11085399 19.04.1999
CN99105333 30.04.1999
EP99107305 19.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1046646Global Dossier 23.06.2004B1
EP1046646 25.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP99107305 19.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69918264T 21.10.2004T2
DE69918264D 29.07.2004D1
Priority number Date
EP99107305 19.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2224483T 01.03.2005T3
Priority number Date
EP99107305 19.04.1999