Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046646

EP1046646 - Bis-silyl tertiary amines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
General Electric Company
One River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Crompton Corporation
Benson Road
Middlebury, CT 06749 / US
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
CROMPTON CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gunther, Michael Lee
24 Richter Drive
Danbury, Connecticut, 06811 / US
02 / Pohl, Eric Raymond
2501 Canterbury Way
Mt. Kisco, New York 10549 / US
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107305.719.04.1999
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046646
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046646
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07F7/18
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/29]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bis-Silyl-tertiäre Amines[2000/43]
English:Bis-silyl tertiary amines[2000/43]
French:Amines tertiaires bis-silylées[2000/43]
Examination procedure12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2003Fee for grant paid
08.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5130401  (ARAI MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column W *;
 [X]  - SHIINA, K. ET AL., "reaction of silicon-containing amino compounds", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19620319), vol. 56, no. 6, Database accession no. 5993a, XP002116469 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - KOGYO KAGAKU ZASSHI, (1960), vol. 63, pages 173 - 175
 [X]  - SHINA, K. ET AL., "synthesis and reaction of silicon-containing amines", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19610807), vol. 55, no. 16, Database accession no. 15341d, XP002116470 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - MEM. FAC. ENG. OSAKA CITY UNIV., (1959), vol. 1, pages 1 - 13