Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0953482

EP0953482 - Airbag device for driver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAKATA CORPORATION
4-30, Roppongi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Igawa, Tadahiro, Takata Corporation
4-30, Roppongi 1-chome
Minato-ku / JP
[1999/44]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1999/44]Kraus, Walter, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107403.026.04.1999
[1999/44]
Priority number, dateJP1998011701027.04.1998         Original published format: JP 11701098
[1999/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0953482
Date:03.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0953482
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0953482
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/20, B60R16/02
[1999/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/22]
Former [1999/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftsack für die Fahrerseite[1999/44]
English:Airbag device for driver[1999/44]
French:Coussin gonflable pour conducteur[1999/44]
Examination procedure02.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/05]
22.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2004Fee for grant paid
04.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5720493  (SUGIYAMA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 25 * * column 7, line 16 - line 19 * * column 7, line 40 - line 45; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]US5499841  (TROJAN DONNA M [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 39; figures 2-4 *;
 [AD]JPH08188109  ;
 [A]US5265905  (SHELTON DARRYL A [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08188109 A 19960723 (NIPPON PLAST CO LTD) [AD] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantJPH08188109
 JPH0966793