Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0956786


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.10.2000 Withdrawal of application published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
25.02.2000 Publication of search report published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
01.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.11.1999 [1999/46]