blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0956786
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT245509Y 22.03.2002Y1
ITTV980014U 05.11.1999U1
Priority number Date
ITTV980014 05.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT248095Y 10.12.2002Y1
ITTV990012U 01.09.2000U1
Priority number Date
ITTV990012 01.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH11332605Global Dossier 07.12.1999A
Priority number Date
ITTV990012 01.03.1999
ITTV980014 05.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0956786Global Dossier 12.04.2000A3
EP0956786 17.11.1999A2
Priority number Date
ITTV990012 01.03.1999
ITTV980014 05.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2270688 05.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
ITTV990012 01.03.1999
ITTV980014 05.05.1998