Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0956786

EP0956786 - Sports shoe, particularly for performing stunts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.10.2000
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.11.2000 [2000/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BENETTON GROUP S.p.A.
Via Villa Minelli 1
31050 Ponzano Veneto (Treviso) / IT
[1999/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Gorza, Roberto
Via C. Rizzarda, 15
32032 Feltre (Belluno) / IT
02 / Belli, Nicola
P. le Concordia, 1
30175 Marghera (Venezia) / IT
03 / Staffaroni, Michael
Via Piave, 21
31017 Crespano del Grappa (Treviso) / IT
04 / Fuser, Daniele
Via G. Canil, 13
31036 Sala D'Istrana (Treviso) / IT
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99107404.826.04.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateIT1998TV0001405.05.1998         Original published format: IT TV980014
IT1999TV0001201.03.1999         Original published format: IT TV990012
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0956786
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0956786
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A43B5/00
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Sportschuh, insbesondere zum Durchführen von Kunststücken[1999/46]
English:Sports shoe, particularly for performing stunts[1999/46]
French:Chaussures de sport, notamment pour réaliser des acrobaties[1999/46]
Examination procedure02.10.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/47]
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9803092  (ARTEMIS) [Y] 1-4,9-14 [A] 5-8;
 [Y]WO9816281  (MEARTHANE) [Y] 1-4,9-14