Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0953868

EP0953868 - Silver halide emulsion, preparation method thereof and silver halide photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugimoto, Hideo
Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ishikawa, Sadayasu
Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1999/44]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]Türk, Gille, Hrabal
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99107449.327.04.1999
[1999/44]
Priority number, dateJP1998013260228.04.1998         Original published format: JP 13260298
[1999/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0953868
Date:03.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0953868
Date:02.08.2000
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0953868
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/005, G03C1/09
[1999/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/15]
Former [1999/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Silberhalogenidemulsion, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und photographisches Silberhalgonidmaterial[1999/44]
English:Silver halide emulsion, preparation method thereof and silver halide photographic material[1999/44]
French:Emulsion à l'halogénure d'argent, procédé pour sa préparation et matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent[1999/44]
Examination procedure06.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
28.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2002Fee for grant paid
22.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.03.2001M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.07.2002
NL31.07.2002
[2005/49]
Former [2003/09]NL31.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5496694  (KIKUCHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 4 * * column 7, line 8 - line 23 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 18 * * column 16, line 4 - line 16 * * column 19, line 18 - line 51 * * column 24, line 38 - line 42 * * column 25, line 61 - column 27, line 2 * * example 2, emulsions C-D * * claims 1,4,12 *;
 [PA]EP0909979  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [PA] 1-24 * page 2, line 49 - line 50 * * page 4, line 18 - line 42 * * page 5, line 22 - line 29 * * page 6, line 8 - line 15 * * page 9, line 42 - line 47 * * page 10, line 9 - line 17 * * page 12, line 36 - line 41 * * example 3, emulsions Em-10, Em-12 * * figure 3 * * claims 1,3-6,8 *;
 [A]EP0348934  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-24 * page 14, line 52 - line 55 * * page 48, line 36 - page 49, line 26 * * examples 1,9,10 * * claims 1-4,8 *;
 [LA]JPH02191938  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [LA] 1-24 * cited in US-A-5496694 *