Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045154

EP1045154 - Coupling device for the end of a control cable to be mounted on the stud of an actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
911 Parklane Towers East Dearborn
Michigan 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
911 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oeltjebruns, Thomas
Bruengesrather Strasse 3
50259 Pulheim / DE
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Drömer, Hans-Carsten , et al
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung NH/DRP
Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Drömer, Hans-Carsten , et al
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
Former [2000/42]Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP
50725 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99107510.215.04.1999
[2000/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045154
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045154
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16C1/22, F16C1/14
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/27]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbindungsanordnung für ein auf einem Bolzen eines Stellgliedes zu montierendes Ende eines Betätigungszuges[2000/42]
English:Coupling device for the end of a control cable to be mounted on the stud of an actuator[2000/42]
French:Dispositif de connexion pour l'extrémité d'un câble de commande à monter sur le téton d'un actionneur[2000/42]
Examination procedure08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/42]
22.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2002Fee for grant paid
15.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE4135309  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 62 - line 66 * * column 3, line 8 - line 17 * * column 3, line 24 - line 38; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE29509798U  (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE8810699U  (VOFA WERK XAVIER VORBRÜGGEN GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 29; figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE4135309
 EP0775881