Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0952765

EP0952765 - Strip for making electrical contact and/or for EMI shielding, and corresponding shielded device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Staniszewski, Walter
Bach 18
83229 Aschau / DE
02 / Häntsch, Ralf
Drosselweg 10
83064 Raubling / DE
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul , et al
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul , et al
Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Former [1999/43]Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Ing , et al
Andrae Flach Haug Prinzregentenstrasse 27
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Application number, filing date99107558.115.04.1999
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateDE199811828523.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19818285
[1999/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0952765
Date:27.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0952765
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0952765
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K9/00
[1999/43]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   NL [2001/11]
Former [1999/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kontaktstreifen zum elektrischen Kontaktieren und/oder zur Erzielung einer gegen hochfrequente elektromagnetische Wellen dichten Verbindung sowie zugehörige Abschirmanordnung[1999/43]
English:Strip for making electrical contact and/or for EMI shielding, and corresponding shielded device[1999/43]
French:Bande de contact électrique et de blindage contre les ondes électromagnétiques ainsi que le dispositif blindé correspondant[1999/43]
Examination procedure29.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
27.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2002Fee for grant paid
21.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AX]EP0563673  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * [X] 2;
 [A]WO8607497  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] * figures 3-6 *;
 [A]EP0757514  (BOPLA GEHAEUSE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] * figure 1 *