Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992743

EP0992743 - Gas boiler with means for accumulating and maintaining hot water for domestic use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 29.03.2006  [2006/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxi S.p.a.
Via Trozzetti, 20
36061 Bassano del Grappa (VI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Baxi S.p.a.
Vai Trozzetti, 20
36061 Bassano del Grappa (Vicenza) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Baggio, Livio
Via Frattalunga, 98
31011 Casella D'Asolo (Treviso) / IT
02 / Del Grosso, Lamberto
Via Monte Sabotino, 23/a
36061 Bassano del Grappa (Vicenza) / IT
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Ripamonti, Enrico , et al
Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Ripamonti, Enrico, Dr. Ing. , et al
Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. s.r.l., 19/B, Via Rosolino Pilo
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99107878.321.04.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0217909.10.1998         Original published format: IT MI982179
[2000/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992743
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992743
Date:14.08.2002
[2002/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992743
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F24H1/50, F24D3/10, F24H1/52, F24H1/48, F24D3/08
[2002/33]
Former International [2000/15]F24H1/50, F24D3/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2003/30]
Former [2003/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  LI 
Former [2003/19](deleted) 
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gaskessel mit Mitteln für die Speicherung und Warmhaltung von Brauchwasser[2000/15]
English:Gas boiler with means for accumulating and maintaining hot water for domestic use[2000/15]
French:Chaudière à gaz avec moyens pour accumuler et maintenir chaude de l'eau sanitaire[2000/15]
Examination procedure15.02.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
19.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
15.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
28.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2004Fee for grant paid
03.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.03.2003AT   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
25.03.2003BE   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
25.03.2003CH   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
25.03.2003CY   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
25.03.2003DE   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
25.03.2003DK   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
25.03.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.03.2003M01   Fee paid on   31.03.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
DE09.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
[2006/13]
Former [2006/12]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
ES19.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
Former [2005/36]AT08.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0692682  (INTEGRA SRL [IT]) [X] 1-4,11,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * figure 3 * * column 2, line 42 - line 48 * * column 3, line 10 - line 12 * * column 3, line 50 - line 59 * * column 4, line 1 - line 5 * * column 4, line 16 - line 23 * * column 5, line 10 * * claims 1,5 *;
 [X]DE9115237U  (JOH. VAILLANT GMBH) [X] 1,2,10,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 12 - line 16 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 2 * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1-5,7 *;
 [E]GB2335029  (BAXI HEATING LTD [GB]) [E] 1-3,5,6,10-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 * * page 1, line 11 - line 13 * * page 1, line 18 - line 25 * * page 1, line 24 * * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, line 21 - line 24 * * page 5, line 20 - line 30 * * page 6, line 2 - line 6 * * figures 1-4 * * claims 1,2,4-9 *;
 [A]EP0784191  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2209594  (PRESSURE UNITS LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *