Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976907

EP0976907 - Actuator for a vertically slidable closure element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arturo Salice S.p.A.
Via Provinciale Novedratese 10
22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Arturo Salice S.p.A.
Via Provinciale Novedratese 10
I-22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Laufhütte, Dieter , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108013.622.04.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE1998213452U28.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29813452 U
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976907
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976907
Date:06.08.2003
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:E05D13/00, E05D15/16, E05D13/12
[2003/15]
Former International [2000/05]E05D13/00, E05D15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   IT [2004/18]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI22.04.1999
TitleGerman:Betätigungsvorrichtung für ein in vertikaler Richtung verschiebliches Verschlusselement[2000/05]
English:Actuator for a vertically slidable closure element[2000/05]
French:Actionneur pour élément de fermeture coulissant verticalement[2000/05]
Examination procedure04.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
05.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0417822  (B & B ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 25 - column 3, line 36; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]GB382220  (HENRI JOSEPH PROSPER POITEVIN) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 9 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2946352  (NAWRATH PETER) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 3; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]DE4013571  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-9 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 14 *;
 [XY]US4374537  (LINDBERGH CHARLES [US]) [X] 13-16 * column 3, lines 33-44 * * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 31 * * claims 17,21,22 * * figures 3,12-15 * [Y] 17;
 [Y]GB184687  (THOMAS DALLOW) [Y] 17 * pages 1-3; figure 2; claims 1-4 *;
 [XY]DE1038947  (CASTON BARBER LTD) [X] 13,14 * columns 1-3; figures 1-3 * [Y] 17