Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0955296

EP0955296 - Tertiary alkyl functionalized piperazine derivatives as anxiolytic and/or antidepressant agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/45]Tertiary alkyl functionalized piperazine derivatives
[2004/10]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wyeth
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
For all designated states
JOHN WYETH & BROTHER LIMITED
Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead
Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Wyeth
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US
For all designated states
JOHN WYETH & BROTHER LIMITED
Huntercombe Lane South Taplow
Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US
For all designated states
JOHN WYETH & BROTHER LIMITED
Huntercombe Lane South Taplow
Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Cliffe, Ian Anthony
14 St Andrews Way
Cippenham, Slough, Berkshire / GB
02 / Abou-Gharbia, Magid Abdel-Megid
26 Hawthorne Drive
Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US
03 / Yardley, John Patrick
154 Hughes Road
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania / US
[2000/03]
Former [1999/45]01 / Cliffe, Ian Anthony
14 St Andrews Way
Cippenham, Slough, Berkshire / GB
02 / Abou-Gharbia, Magid Abdel-Megid
6 James Haywardway
Glen Mills, Pennsylvania / US
03 / Yardley, John Patrick
154 Hughes Road
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania / US
Representative(s)Wileman, David Francis
Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead
Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Wileman, David Francis Dr.
Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB
Former [1999/45]Walters, Philip Bernard William
Wyeth Laboratories, Patents & Trade Marks Department, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
Application number, filing date99108070.620.04.1990
[1999/45]
Priority number, dateGB1989000920922.04.1989         Original published format: GB 8909209
US1989042814827.10.1989         Original published format: US 428148
[1999/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0955296
Date:10.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0955296
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D295/12, C07D295/08, C07D239/42, C07D295/14, A61K31/495
[1999/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/45]
TitleGerman:Tertiäre alkyl funktionalisierte Piperazin-Derivate als Anxiolytikun und/oder Antidepressivum[2004/10]
English:Tertiary alkyl functionalized piperazine derivatives as anxiolytic and/or antidepressant agents[2004/10]
French:Dérivés de pipérazine avec une fonction alkyle tertiaire utiles comme agents anxiolytiques et /ou antidépresseurs[2004/11]
Former [1999/45]Tertiäre alkyl funktionalisierte Piperazin-Derivate
Former [1999/45]Tertiary alkyl functionalized piperazine derivatives
Former [1999/45]Dérivés de pipérazine avec une fonction alkyle tertiaire
Examination procedure20.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
18.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/53]
28.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/53]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP90304251.3  / EP0395313
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 11
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 12
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 13
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 14
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
23.04.199903   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
23.04.199904   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
23.04.199905   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
23.04.199906   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
23.04.199907   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
23.04.199908   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
23.04.199909   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1999
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0048045  (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,12-14 * claim - *;
 [XD]US4202898  (DEPOORTERE HENRI [FR]) [XD] 1,2,5,7,8,10,12-14 * example 21; claim - *;
 [A]EP0015615  (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [A] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [A]GB2155925  (BRISTOL MYERS CO) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0238905  (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-14 * example 2; claim - *;
 [DA]US4797489  (ABOU-GHARBIA MAGID A [US], et al) [DA] 1-14 * example -; claim - *