Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0953812

EP0953812 - Refrigerating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
[1999/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Haas, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Tannhäuserweg 8
89518 Heidenheim / DE
02 / Pflomm, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing.
Heckenbühl 58
89075 Ulm / DE
03 / Nuiding, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Hossenriedstrasse 44/2
89537 Giengen / DE
[1999/44]
Application number, filing date99108078.923.04.1999
[1999/44]
Priority number, dateDE199811828823.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19818288
[1999/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0953812
Date:03.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0953812
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F25B39/02, F25D11/02
[1999/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [2000/40]
Former [1999/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI27.07.2000
TitleGerman:Kühlgerät[1999/44]
English:Refrigerating apparatus[1999/44]
French:Appareil frigorifique[1999/44]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
27.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
24.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB850866  (PHILCO CORPORATION) [Y] 1,4,6 * page 4, line 1 - line 19; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0732553  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [Y] 1,4,6 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 54; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3263440  (A.G.HELLSTROM) [A] 1 * column 7, line 39 - line 64; figure 6 *;
 [A]DE3224452  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE)