blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0953812 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0953812



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 45
10.06.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
16.08.2000 Late payment of examination fee/designation fees without additional fee(s) Search / examination 3
16.08.2000 Late payment of extension or validation fees without surcharge Search / examination 2
01.02.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
22.09.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.07.1999 Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee Search / examination 3
23.04.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
23.04.1999 Description Search / examination 5
23.04.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
23.04.1999 Priority document Search / examination 10
23.04.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6