blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0953812


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.02.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
17.10.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
11.08.2000 Request for examination filed published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
09.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
09.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
04.08.2000 Change - extension states
11.12.1999 Publication of search report published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
17.09.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.11.1999 [1999/44]
26.07.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
26.07.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
29.06.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
29.06.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
29.06.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)