blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0953812
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0953812Global Dossier 26.01.2000A3
EP0953812 03.11.1999A2
Priority number Date
DE19818288 23.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19818288 30.04.2009B4
DE19818288 28.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19818288 23.04.1998