Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0953812

Designated contracting statesDE 
ES 
IT 
Examination procedure24.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.11.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE ES IT
 
Event date:03.11.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000727
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE ES IT
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 20000727
 
Event date:04.04.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20000727