blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0997638

EP0997638 - System for dynamic diagnosis of apparatus operating conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snap-on Incorporated
2801-80th Street
Kenosha, WI 53143 / US
[2007/06]
Former [2006/38]For all designated states
Snap-on Tools Company
2801- 80th Street
Kenosha, WI 53141-1410 / US
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
SNAP-ON TOOLS CORPORATION
2801 - 80th Street
Kenosha, Wisconsin 53141-1410 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rother, Paul J.
254 Bobolink Drive
Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)de Baat, Michiel Anton, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/08]de Baat, Michiel Anton, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2006/03](deleted)
Former [2000/18]Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, et al
Mozartstrasse 23
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108097.923.04.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateUS1998017974727.10.1998         Original published format: US 179747
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997638
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997638
Date:12.06.2002
[2002/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997638
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2002
ClassificationIPC:F02P17/08, G01M17/007
[2002/24]
CPC:
G01M17/007 (EP,US); A61B5/00 (KR); G01M17/00 (US);
G01D21/00 (US); G07C5/0808 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/18]F02P17/08
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/10]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur dynamischen Diagnose einer Vorrichtung[2000/18]
English:System for dynamic diagnosis of apparatus operating conditions[2000/18]
French:Système pour le diagnostic dynamique des conditions de fonctionnement d'un dispositif[2006/38]
Former [2000/18]Système pour le diagnostic dynamique des conditions de foctionnement d'un dispositif
Examination procedure19.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
13.02.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2006Date of oral proceedings
23.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2006Fee for grant paid
30.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE14.02.2007
FR14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]BE14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
FR05.10.2007
Former [2008/16]BE14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US4796206  (BOSCOVE JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * column W *;
 [PA]US5835871  (SMITH MARY V [US], et al) [PA] 1,5,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5631831  (BIRD JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5729452  (SMITH MARY V [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5541840  (GURNE KRZYSZTOF [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4658370  (ERMAN LEE D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5408412  (HOGG GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]US5442549  (LARSON TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1 * column A *
by applicantUS5250935
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.