EP1048794 - Faucet support structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krausz Metal Industries Ltd. 8 Hapatish Street 66559 Tel Aviv / IL | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krausz, Eliezer 10 Soutine St. 64684 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
Chiproot, Avi 8 Hakalanit St. Kfar Saba / IL | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108161.3 | 26.04.1999 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048794 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/042 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserhahnbefestigungsstruktur | [2000/44] | English: | Faucet support structure | [2000/44] | French: | Structure de support de robinet | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/09] | 05.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19726483 (KOENEKE RALF) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 17 * * column 8, line 11 - line 17 * * figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2537437 (AABY OSCAR L.) [A] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9312742U (JAEGER REINHARD) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 25 - line 36 * * page 4, line 15 - line 24 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5031940 (STEFANOS KILIMIS) [A] 7 * column 5, line 7 - line 34 * * figures 1-6 * |