Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965884

EP0965884 - Phase shift mask and methods of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.04.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.05.2009  [2009/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2003/45]
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schulze, Steffen F.
24 Bell Air Lane
Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date99108176.126.04.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateUS1998009878517.06.1998         Original published format: US 98785
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965884
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965884
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03F1/00, G03F9/00
[1999/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/50]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Phasenschiebermaske und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1999/51]
English:Phase shift mask and methods of manufacture[1999/51]
French:Masque à décalage de phase et procédé pour sa fabrication[1999/51]
Examination procedure10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
28.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE
04.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/20]
15.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/20]
16.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2009Invitation to provide information on prior art
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
17.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19632845  (LG SEMICON CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,14,15 * column 1, line 58 - line 63 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US5733690  (JEONG SEONG-KIL [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5017514  (NISHIMOTO SHOZO [JP]);
 [A]US5498500  (BAE SANG M [KR]) [A] * the whole document *