EP0969171 - Cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Matthias c/o Rehau AG + Co. / 95111 Rehau / DE | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 99108218.1 | 27.04.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998211815U | 02.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29811815 U | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0969171 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0969171 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969171 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05C19/06, B60R19/04, B60D1/60, B60R19/02 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B60D1/60 (EP);
B60R19/48 (EP);
B62D25/24 (EP);
E05C19/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | E05C19/06, B60R19/04, B60D1/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/40] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abdeckung | [2000/01] | English: | Cover | [2000/01] | French: | Couvercle | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 25.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.10.2003 | SE | 15.01.2004 | [2004/33] |
Former [2004/24] | SE | 15.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0829600 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0337220 (REGGIANI SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE1908121U (AUTO UNION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE2753539 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | DE4342981 |