Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968862

EP0968862 - Sliding window for a motor vehicle door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.05.2011
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DURA Automotive Body & Glass Systems GmbH
Königstrasse 57
58840 Plettenberg / DE
[2011/25]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
DURA Automotive Body & Glass Systems GmbH
Königstrasse 57
58840 Plettenberg / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Schade GmbH & Co. KG
Königstrasse 57
58840 Plettenberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gucinski, Uwe
Am Kör 40a
58840 Plettenberg / DE
02 / Kraus, Jürgen
Märkische Strasse 67
58802 Balve / DE
03 / Schneider, Frank
Am Papenberg 34
58762 Altena / DE
04 / Schulte, Martin
Auf der Gabel 33
58802 Balve / DE
05 / Vornbäumen, Jens
Europaring 3
58762 Altena / DE
06 / Winkhaus, Kai
Am Halse 9
58762 Altena / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Laufhütte, Dieter , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108351.028.04.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812981603.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829816
DE199814122209.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19841222
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968862
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968862
Date:16.08.2001
[2001/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968862
Date:21.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/30]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0968862
Date:22.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/25]
Former [2001/32]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP0968862
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[2001/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60J1/16
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [2002/19]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schiebefenster für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür[2000/01]
English:Sliding window for a motor vehicle door[2000/01]
French:Fenêtre coulissante pour véhicule automobile[2000/01]
Examination procedure10.08.2000Observations by third parties
24.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
24.10.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
07.11.2001Observations by third parties
31.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
12.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2004Fee for grant paid
24.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.03.2005  19.05.2005  ADMISSIBLE
WAGON SAS
5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet - ZI no.2 BP 59
F-79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Vidon, Patrice
Cabinet Vidon
Technopole Atalante
16B Rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2005  19.05.2005  ADMISSIBLE
WAGON SAS
5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet - ZI no.2 BP 59
F-79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Vidon, Patrice
Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
Former [2005/19]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2005  19.05.2005  ADMISSIBLE
WAGON SAS
5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet - ZI no.2 BP 59
F-79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Vidon, Patrice
Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
06.06.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.02.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.10.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.10.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.03.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.05.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition08.08.2008Appeal received No.  T1483/08
16.10.2008Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2010Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
24.07.2008Appeal received No.  T1483/08
13.10.2008Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2010Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
12.11.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT28.04.2007
[2010/06]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5613323  (BUENING DENNIS J [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 20; figures 2,8,9,12,13 * [A] 12,13;
 [XA]DE8814603U  (HAUTAU) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [A] 9,11,14;
 [XA]DE4038900  (CLEFF GMBH) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 56 - line 67; figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 11 * [A] 4,7;
 [A]EP0673820  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,7,8,12-14 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 7; figure . * * column 4, line 13 - line 33 *;
 [A]EP0778168  (FARNIER & PENIN [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *
otherEP0778168
 US5613323
OppositionEP0956987
 US5522191
 FR2552483
 US4850139
 US4561224
 EP0445685