blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0972927 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0972927



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 372
11.07.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.08.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.07.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
24.07.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
24.07.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
24.07.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
24.07.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 54
24.07.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 70
24.03.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.03.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.03.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
24.03.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 72
14.02.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
14.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
14.02.2006 Description Search / examination 4
14.02.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.06.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
24.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
24.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.02.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.09.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
26.08.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.08.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
23.08.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
27.05.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.01.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.05.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.04.2002 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 European search report Search / examination 3
15.02.2002 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
20.12.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.11.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
16.11.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.11.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
16.11.2001 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.04.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 10
28.04.1999 Description Search / examination 48
28.04.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.1999 Drawings Search / examination 21
28.04.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6