blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0972927


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.04.2008 Change - representative published on  28.05.2008  [2008/22]
13.07.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.08.2007  [2007/33]
04.08.2006 (Expected) grant published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
02.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.03.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.02.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.12.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.07.2005 Change - representative published on  17.08.2005  [2005/33]
22.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.09.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.09.2004 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
01.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.09.2004 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
27.08.2004 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
24.08.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.05.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.01.2004 First examination report
08.01.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.04.2003 Renewal fee
05.03.2003 Change - extension states
15.11.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
27.04.2002 Renewal fee
02.03.2002 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2002  [2002/16]
15.02.2002 Publication of search report published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
25.04.2001 Renewal fee
03.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]