blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0972927
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4186259BGlobal Dossier 26.11.2008B2
JP2000034946 02.02.2000A
Priority number Date
JP20357498 17.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4055256BGlobal Dossier 05.03.2008B2
JP2000034943 02.02.2000A
Priority number Date
JP20357598 17.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0972927Global Dossier 06.09.2006B1
EP0972927 03.04.2002A3
EP0972927 19.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP20357598 17.07.1998
JP20357498 17.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69933091T 01.03.2007T2
DE69933091D 19.10.2006D1
Priority number Date
JP20357598 17.07.1998
JP20357498 17.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100362357B 23.11.2002B1
KR20000011279 25.02.2000A
Priority number Date
JP20357598 17.07.1998
JP20357498 17.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6244046 12.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP20357598 17.07.1998
JP20357498 17.07.1998