Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972927

EP0972927 - Engine exhaust purification system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Denso Corporation
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamashita, Yukihiro
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108366.828.04.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020357417.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20357498
JP1998020357517.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20357598
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972927
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972927
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972927
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/14, F01N3/20
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/01]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abgasreinigungssystem und- verfahren für eine Brennkraftmaschine[2000/03]
English:Engine exhaust purification system and method[2000/03]
French:Système et méthode de purification de gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne[2000/03]
Examination procedure05.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
12.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2006Fee for grant paid
24.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Request for further processing for:23.08.2004Request for further processing filed
23.08.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.09.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9827322  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [X] 1,22 * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 5 * * page 7, line 35 - page 8, line 6 *;
 [PXA]GB2324052  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [PX] 1 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 11 * [PA] 2,3;
 [A]JPH06307230  ;
 [X]EP0735250  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 15-18 * column 1, line 5 - line 54 * * column 4, line 49 - line 53 * * figures 8,10 *;
 [X]EP0733787  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 15-18 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 28 * * column 3, line 42 - line 49 * * column 12, line 30 - column 13, line 2 * * figures 7,10 *;
 [X]EP0844379  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 19,20 * page 3, line 21 - line 34 * * figure 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5673555  (ACHLEITNER ERWIN [DE]) [X] 19,21 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US5377484  (SHIMIZU YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 19,21 * column 17, line 52 - line 68 * * figure 13 * * claims 1,9-11 *;
 [X]US5303580  (SCHNEIDER ERICH [DE], et al) [X] 19,21 * claims 1,6 *;
 [X]US5303548  (SHIMIZU YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 19,21 * claim 1 *;
 [XA]US5693877  (OHSUGA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 19 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, line 35 - line 61 * * figure - * [A] 20,21;
 [XA]EP0690213  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 19,20 * column 1, line 12 - column 3, line 23 * * figure 1 * [A] 21
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPS6454274
 JPH01110853