Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970714

EP0970714 - Actuator for independent axial and rotational actuation of a catheter or similar elongated object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Wendlandt, Jeffrey Michael
20 Chauncy Street No. 2
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / Morgan, Frederick Marshall
157 Butler Road
Qunicy, MA 02169 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Reitzle, Helmut , et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Reitzle, Helmut, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108415.329.04.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011327310.07.1998         Original published format: US 113273
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970714
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970714
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M19/00, G09B23/28, G05G9/04, G06F3/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Betätigungsvorrichtung zur unabhängigen Axial- und Drehbewegung eines Katheters oder ähnlichen länglichen Gegenstands[2000/02]
English:Actuator for independent axial and rotational actuation of a catheter or similar elongated object[2000/02]
French:Dispositif d'actionnement pour imprimer des mouvements indépendants axiaux et de rotation à un cathéter ou un autre objet allongé[2000/02]
Examination procedure31.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
26.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/19]
26.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5623582  (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) [A] 1,6-9,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9616397  (IMMERSION HUMAN INTERFACE CORP [US]) [A] 1,6-9,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9628800  (HIGH TECHSPLANATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1,6-9,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9719440  (IMMERSION HUMAN INTERFACE CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,6-8,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9809580  (IMMERSION HUMAN INTERFACE CORP [US]) [A] 1,6-9 * the whole document *