Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970673

EP0970673 - Dressing for covering especially the edge areas of artificial body openings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Resorba Chirurgisches Nahtmaterial Franz Hiltner GmbH & Co.
Schonerstrasse 7
90443 Nürnberg / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Hiltner, Claus Martin
Krelingstrasse 35
D-90408 Nürnberg / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Schneck, Herbert , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner
Patentanwälte
Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr. , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99108457.530.04.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813042108.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830421
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970673
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970673
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/36]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pflaster zur Abdeckung insbesondere des Randbereiches künstlicher Körperöffnungen[2000/02]
English:Dressing for covering especially the edge areas of artificial body openings[2000/02]
French:Pansement pour recouvrir notamment les zones entourant des orifices artificiels du corps[2000/02]
Examination procedure25.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
13.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.10.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.07.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3908658  (MARSAN ARTHUR E) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 30 *;
 [A]US5015228  (COLUMBUS RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US3782377  (RYCHLIK F) [A] 3 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 20 *;
 [A]US5741235  (KNIGHT JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-5 * column W *