Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976502

EP0976502 - Retaining device of socket spanner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shih, Leo
No.5, Lane 54, San Min Road Sec. 3
Taichung / TW
[2002/08]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Shih, Leo
No.5, Lane 54, San Min Road
Taichung / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Winkler, Andreas, Dr. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108694.318.05.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE1998213496U29.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29813496 U
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976502
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976502
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976502
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B25B23/10, B25B13/06
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/03]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nuss mit Haltevorrichtung[2000/05]
English:Retaining device of socket spanner[2000/05]
French:Dispositif de retenue pour douille[2000/05]
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
08.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.02.2002Fee for grant paid
26.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Former [2003/31]DE01.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US3835737  (CARR H) [X] 1-4 * column W *;
 [X]US5724872  (SHIH LEO [TW]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 35; figures 2-4 *;
 [PX]DE29813497U  (SHIH LEO [TW]) [PX] 1-4 * figure -; claim - *;
 [E]DE29907298U  (SHIH [TW]) [E] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *;
 [E]DE29907299U  (SHIH [TW]) [E] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4607547  (MARTUS DONALD G [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 15 - line 24; figures 9,10 *
by applicantUS19960672859