blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1037295

EP1037295 - Method for applying electrode layers on a tape-like polymer electrolyte membrane for fuel cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2005Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 14.12.2005  [2005/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
[2003/48]
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
OMG AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau / DE
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Starz, Karl-Anton Dr.
Adolf-Reichwein-Strasse 12
63517 Rodenbach / DE
02 / Zuber, Ralf Dr.
Valentin-Hock-Strasse 11
63762 Grossostheim / DE
03 / Göttenauer Wolfgang Dr.
Ringstrasse 34
63486 Bruchköbel / DE
04 / Fehl, Knut
Am Gläserberg 8
36381 Schlüchtern-Raumholz / DE
05 / Diehl, Manfred Dr.
Zeuläcker Strasse 40
60389 Frankfurt / DE
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Stellbrink, Axel, et al
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/04]Stellbrink, Axel, et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/16]Herrmann, Reinhard, Dr.
OMG AG & Co. KG, F&E und Innovationsmanagement, Patente, Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
Application number, filing date99108791.703.05.1999
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateDE1999101077311.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910773
[2000/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037295
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037295
Date:13.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/24]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1037295
Date:14.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01M8/10, C25B9/10
[2000/38]
CPC:
B41M3/006 (EP,US); B05D7/04 (KR); B41M1/26 (EP,US);
B41M1/30 (EP,US); B41M3/008 (EP,US); C25B9/23 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US); B41M1/04 (EP,US); B41M1/06 (EP,US);
B41M1/10 (EP,US); B41M1/12 (EP,US); H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP); Y02P70/50 (EP,US); Y10T29/49115 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/23]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Aufbringen von Elektrodenschichten auf eine bandförmige Polymerelektrolytmembran für Brennstoffzellen[2000/38]
English:Method for applying electrode layers on a tape-like polymer electrolyte membrane for fuel cells[2000/38]
French:Méthode pour déposer des couches d'électrodes sur une membrane en électrolyte polymérique sous forme de ruban pour piles à combustible[2000/38]
Examination procedure03.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/38]
03.05.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
25.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2000Fee for grant paid
16.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.03.2002  15.10.2002  WITHDRAWN
Johnson Matthey Technology Centre
Blount's Court, Sonning Common
GB - Reading RG4 9NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Wishart, Ian Carmichael
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common
Reading, RG4 9NH / GB
 02  13.03.2002  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Ballard Power Systems Inc.
9000 Glenlyon Parkway
Burnaby B.C.V5J5J9 / CA
Opponent's representative
Hörner, Andreas
HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/50]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2002  15.10.2002  WITHDRAWN
Johnson Matthey Technology Centre
Blount's Court, Sonning Common
GB - Reading RG4 9NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Wishart, Ian Carmichael
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common
Reading, RG4 9NH / GB
 02  13.03.2002  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Ballard Power Systems Inc.
9000 Glenlyon Parkway
Burnaby B.C.V5J5J9 / CA
Opponent's representative
Hörner, Andreas
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte GBR Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/19]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2002    WITHDRAWN
Johnson Matthey Technology Centre
Blount's Court, Sonning Common
GB - Reading RG4 9NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Wishart, Ian Carmichael
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common
Reading, RG4 9NH / GB
 02  13.03.2002    ADMISSIBLE
Ballard Power Systems Inc.
9000 Glenlyon Parkway
Burnaby B.C.V5J5J9 / CA
Opponent's representative
Hörner, Andreas
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte GBR Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
18.04.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.03.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.03.2005Date of oral proceedings
06.06.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.06.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.09.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.10.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9723916  (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,12,14 * figure 5; claims 1,3,8,11,12,14,16,19,20,28,29,32,37,39 * * page 12, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 3 * * page 18, paragraph 4 - page 19, paragraph 4 * * page 21, paragraph 2 * * page 26, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 9,10 * * page 27, paragraph L - page 28, paragraph 1; figure 12 * * page 30, paragraph 2 - page 31, paragraph 2 * * page 31, paragraph 6 * [Y] 5,6,11,13;
 [Y]DE19509748  (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [Y] 11,13 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 9; claims 1,12,13 *;
 [Y]US5211984  (WILSON MAHLON S [US]) [Y] 5,6 * column 6, line 24 - line 59 *;
 [DA]DE19611510  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DA] 5,6 * example 1; claim 4 *;
 [A]EP0731520  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1,9,17 * * column 7, line 42 - line 50 * * column 8, line 27 - line 33 *;
 [A]JPH1064574  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 098, no. 008, & JP10064574 A 19980306 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 98-222669, XP002110924 [ ] * abstract *
OppositionWO9215121
 JPS6464574
 WO9919929
 US4172353
 US4822544
    - Zawodzinski et al: "Characterisation of polymer electrolytes for fuel cell applications", Solid State Ionics, Vol. 60 (1993), 199-211
    - Du Pont: product information sheet for the Nafion (registered trademark) membranes NE-112, NE-1135, N-115 and N-117
    - Du Pont: product information sheet for the Nafion (registered trademark) membranes NR-111 + NR-112
    - European Patent Register Excerpt: WO 99/19929
    - "Development of the BAM Membrane for fuel cell applications", Proceedings of New Materials for Fuel Cell and Modern Battery Systems II"; Montreal, CA, July 6-10, 1997, Seite 792 bis 807
    - James et al: "Hydration of Nafion (registered trademark) studied by AFM and X-ray scattering", Journal of Materials Science, Vol. 35, (2000), 5111-5119
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.