Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0956932

EP0956932 - Device for cutting up elongated work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gutser, Franz
Promenadenweg 23
89165 Dietenheim / DE
[1999/46]
Inventor(s)01 / GUTSER Franz
Promenadenweg 23
89165 DIETENHEIM / DE
02 / GUTSER Manuel
Flösserweg 31
88486 SINNENGEN / DE
[2000/03]
Former [1999/46]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Weber, Gerhard
Patentanwalt
Postfach 2029
89010 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]Weber, Gerhard
Patentanwalt Postfach 2029
89010 Ulm / DE
Application number, filing date99108991.306.05.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateDE199812155614.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19821556
[1999/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0956932
Date:17.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0956932
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0956932
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B27B5/22, B27B25/04, B23D45/10
[2000/24]
Former International [1999/46]B27B5/22, B23D45/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   LI,   SE [2001/08]
Former [1999/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Trennanordnung zum Aufteilen von langgestreckter Werkstücke[1999/46]
English:Device for cutting up elongated work pieces[1999/46]
French:Dispositif pour couper des pièces allongées[1999/46]
Examination procedure08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
03.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2002Fee for grant paid
29.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
[2004/22]
Former [2004/02]IE15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US2569878  (AVINGER ERNEST C, et al) [X] 1-3,11,14-16,18 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 68 - line 74 *;
 [X]GB671888  (JAN SESTAK) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11,16 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 37 * * figure - *;
 [X]US4259886  (SEID BOBBY P, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,14,16,18 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 59 * * column 4, line 25 - line 68 * * figure - *;
 [X]US4005625  (BROCHU ANDRE, et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,13,14,18 * column 3, line 59 - line 68 * * column 4, line 26 - line 30 * * column 4, line 43 - line 44 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 6 * * column 5, line 26 - line 33 * * column 8, line 28 - line 31 * * figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]US4068549  (HUFFMAN JAMES EARLE) [A] 12 * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * figure 1 *