Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971220

EP0971220 - Device for determining the temperature of the windings in an electrical motor operated by a control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Kessler, Martin
Prälat-Brommer-Strasse 10
77815 Buehl / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date99108994.706.05.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199812540906.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19825409
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971220
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971220
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01K7/42, B60S1/08, G01K7/16, G01K13/04, G01K7/20
[2000/05]
Former International [2000/02]G01K7/42, B60S1/08
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/41]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Erfassung der Wicklungstemperatur eines über eine Steuerschaltung betriebenen Elektromotors[2000/02]
English:Device for determining the temperature of the windings in an electrical motor operated by a control circuit[2000/02]
French:Dispositif pour déterminer la température de l'enroulement d'un moteur électrique opéré par un circuit de commande[2000/02]
Examination procedure03.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
09.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: Application not forwarded to EPO in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE3114135  (AESCULAP WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 11, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 17; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3;
 [YA]GB2073432  (ACCURATE CONTROLS LTD) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 66 - line 97 * * page 2, line 23 - line 32; figures 1,2 * [A] 4;
 [A]FR2403550  (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 18; figure 2 *;
 [A]SU1500866  (KB I INZH ZHELEZNODOROZH [SU]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH1062266
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10062266 A 19980306 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *