Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972965

EP0972965 - Rotational speed adaptive damper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2002/04]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eckel, Hans-Gerd Dr.
Wagnerstr.11
69514 Laudenbach / DE
02 / Kunkel, Anja
Am Hardberg 14
69483 Siedelsbrunn / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99109173.710.05.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813115411.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831154
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972965
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972965
Date:09.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/14
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehzahladaptiver Schwingungstilger[2000/03]
English:Rotational speed adaptive damper[2000/03]
French:Amortisseur adaptatif de vélocité rotative[2000/03]
Examination procedure17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
04.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2002Fee for grant paid
12.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19654915  (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12-14 * column 3, lines 24-42; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE727378  (SULZER AG) [A] 1,4,6-8,11 * figure -; claim 2 *;
 [DA]DE19631989  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE4238683  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 14 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]DE4427636  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 14 * column 5, lines 62-68; figure - *;
 [A]DE19604160  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *