Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054423

EP1054423 - Electric power supplying and recovering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Liu, Pin Yin
3F, No.7, Bau An Road
Yong Ho City, Taipei Hsien / TW
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109202.419.05.1999
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054423
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01H47/32, H02M3/158
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/32]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrische Stromversorgungs- und Stromrückgewinnungsvorrichtung[2000/47]
English:Electric power supplying and recovering apparatus[2000/47]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation et récupération de puissance électrique[2000/47]
Examination procedure12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
25.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5796223  (OHTSUKA MASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 15, line 39 - column 16, line 33; figure 11 *;
 [YA]EP0793334  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4 * page 11, line 33 - line 49; figure 19 * [A] 2,3;
 [Y]DE2451477  (TRIUMPH WERKE NUERNBERG AG) [Y] 1,4 * page 4, line 15 - line 28; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0548915  (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *