blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0970728

Designated contracting states(deleted) 
Examination procedure20.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
31.05.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200204   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:17.07.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:22.08.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE 8566
Code Expl.:-DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID
 
Event date:22.01.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20020425