Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970728

EP0970728 - Wheel assembly for in-line roller skates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.01.2003  [2003/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plexus, LLC
16918 East 14th Street San Leandro
California 94578 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Plexus, LLC
16918 East 14th Street
San Leandro, California 94578 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Goetzl, Brent A.
9 Irving Lane
Orinda, California 94563 / US
02 / Rathbun, Richard W.
15 Southwood Court
Oakland, California 94611 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Käck, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Käck, Jürgen , et al
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [2000/02]Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date99109225.521.05.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011129307.07.1998         Original published format: US 111293
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970728
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970728
Date:24.10.2001
[2001/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A63C17/06, A63C17/22
[2000/02]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/29]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Laufrollen-Kombination für Einspurrollschuhe[2000/02]
English:Wheel assembly for in-line roller skates[2000/02]
French:Jeu de roulettes pour patins à roulettes en ligne[2000/02]
Examination procedure25.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/04]
20.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
31.05.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5649716  (ZHANG SHIN-CHIU [TW]) [A] 1,2,9,15 * column 1, paragraph 12; figures 2,3 *