Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964481

EP0964481 - Waterproof connector and assembling method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2007/22]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murakami, Takao c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
206-1 Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0407 / JP
02 / Fukuda, Masaru c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
206-1 Nunobikibara,Haibara-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0407 / JP
 [2008/31]
Former [1999/50]01 / Murakami, Takao, c/o Yazaki Parts Co.Ltd.
206-1 Nunobikibara,Haibara-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0407 / JP
02 / Fukuda, Masaru, c/o Yazaki Parts Co.Ltd.
206-1 Nunobikibara,Haibara-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0407 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109255.226.05.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateJP1998016252110.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16252198
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964481
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964481
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0964481
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52, H01R13/506
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserdichter Verbinder und Zusammenbauverfahren[1999/50]
English:Waterproof connector and assembling method of the same[1999/50]
French:Connecteur étanche et procédé d'assemblage[1999/50]
Examination procedure26.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
30.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2008Fee for grant paid
28.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
[2010/28]
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH07130425  ;
 [A]DE19641408  (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US5634807  (SAITO HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, [A] 1,2,6 * abstract *