Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0961518

EP0961518 - Operator directed routing of connections in a digital communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.2009
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Canada Inc.
600 March Road
Kanata, ON K2K 2E6 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Alcatel Canada Inc.
600 March Road Kanata
Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Alcatel Canada Inc.
600 March Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
Newbridge Networks Corporation
600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / McAllister, Shawn
13 Rosemeade Place
Nepean, Ontario K2G 5V9 / CA
02 / Tooker, Mark
204 Barrow Crescent
Kanata, Ontario K2L 2C7 / CA
03 / Veeneman, Ron
480 Townline West, R.R. No.1
Carleton Place, Ontario K7C 4E4 / CA
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Korakis-Ménager, Sophie
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54, Rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Korakis-Ménager, Sophie
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2008/28]Korakis-Ménager, Sophie
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2001/47]Feray, Valérie , et al
Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Former [1999/48]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109317.028.05.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateCA1998223903228.05.1998         Original published format: CA 2239032
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0961518
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0961518
Date:12.06.2002
[2002/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961518
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/56
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/48]
Extension statesAL12.12.2002
LT12.12.2002
LV12.12.2002
MK12.12.2002
RO12.12.2002
SI12.12.2002
TitleGerman:Von einer Bedienungsperson durchgeführte Verbindungssteuerung (Routing) in einem digitalen Kommunikationsnetz[1999/48]
English:Operator directed routing of connections in a digital communications network[1999/48]
French:Routage de connexions dans un réseau de communication digital dirigé par un operateur[1999/48]
Examination procedure12.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/07]
04.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
16.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2008Fee for grant paid
19.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CY05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
IT05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
GR06.02.2009
PT06.04.2009
IE28.05.2009
LU28.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/25]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
IT05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
GR06.02.2009
PT06.04.2009
IE28.05.2009
LU28.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/28]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PT06.04.2009
IE28.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/19]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PT06.04.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/06]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PT06.04.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2009/32]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
Former [2009/30]AT05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0798945  (GEN DATACOMM IND INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 1 - column 14, line 44; figures 1-8; claims 1-17 *;
 [X]WO9716005  (NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 19; figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]  SCOTT J M ET AL, THE ATM FORUM'S PRIVATE NETWORK/NETWORK INTERFACE, BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, BT LABORATORIES, GB, VOL. 16, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 37-46, ISSN 1358-3948, XP000750517 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009661714128
 [A]  BLACK U, ATM, Volume II Signaling in broadband networks, ATM: SIGNALING IN BROADBAND NETWORKS, PRENTICE HALL SERIES IN ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGIES, UPPER SADDLE RIVER, NJ: PRENTICE HALL, US, VOL. VOL. 2, PAGE(S) 159-179, ISBN 0-13-571837-6, XP002080340 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  GREMMELMAIER U ET AL, PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF THE PNNI ROUTING PROTOCOL USING AN EMULATION TOOL, ISS '97. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM). GLOBAL NETWORK EVOLUTION: CONVERGENCE OR COLLISION? TORONTO, SEPT. 21 - 26, 1997, ISS. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM), TORONTO, P, XP000720545 [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004]; figure 2 *